AK HB408 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/20/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/20/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to misconduct involving weapons.
Title
Misconduct Involving Weapons
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/20/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/22 CHAPTER 100 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:13 PM 6/1/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-15 | VERSION: CSHB 408(JUD) | |
2010-04-15 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-15 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 408(JUD) | |
2010-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | FN2: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-04-14 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-14 | NR: COGHILL | |
2010-04-14 | DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-04-14 | JUD RPT 2DP 1NR | |
2010-04-11 | JUD | |
2010-04-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-10 | VERSION: CSHB 408(JUD) | |
2010-04-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-10 | PASSED Y38 A2 | |
2010-04-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 408(JUD) | |
2010-04-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-10 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | FN2: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-04-09 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-09 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, KELLY, SALMON, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-09 | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 9DP | |
2010-03-26 | FN2: ZERO(DPS) | |
2010-03-26 | FN1: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-03-26 | NR: HERRON, GATTO | |
2010-03-26 | DP: LYNN, RAMRAS | |
2010-03-26 | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 2DP 2NR | |
2010-02-26 | JUD, FIN | |
2010-02-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |