AK HB384 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act increasing the minimum wage; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Alaska Minimum Wage
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Letter of Intent (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Letter of Intent (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Letter of Intent (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-13 - House - House: Second Reading Letter of Intent (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FIN |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-13 | House | VERSION: HB 384 AM |
2014-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40 |
2014-04-13 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N19 |
2014-04-13 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-04-13 | House | JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y39 N1 |
2014-04-13 | House | PASSED Y22 N18 |
2014-04-13 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2014-04-13 | House | ADOPTED Y30 N10 |
2014-04-13 | House | HOUSE LETTER OF INTENT OFFERED |
2014-04-13 | House | AM NO 3 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-13 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-13 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-13 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AM UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 384 |
2014-04-10 | House | HELD TO 4/13 CALENDAR |
2014-04-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR |
2014-04-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2014-04-09 | House | AM: HERRON |
2014-04-09 | House | NR: REINBOLD, SADDLER |
2014-04-09 | House | DNP: JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-09 | House | DP: MILLETT, CHENAULT, OLSON |
2014-04-09 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM |
2014-04-04 | House | L&C |
2014-04-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |