AK HB37 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to deposits into the dividend fund; relating to income of and appropriations from the earnings reserve account; relating to the taxation of income of individuals, partners, shareholders in S corporations, trusts, and estates; relating to a payment against the individual income tax from the permanent fund dividend disbursement; repealing tax credits applied against the tax on individuals under the Alaska Net Income Tax Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Income Tax; Permanent Fund; Earnings Res.
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Wool [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-28 | House | FN7: (REV) |
2022-02-28 | House | FN6: (REV) |
2022-02-28 | House | FN5: (REV) |
2022-02-28 | House | FN4: (ADM) |
2022-02-28 | House | NR: CLAMAN, STORY, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-02-28 | House | DNP: EASTMAN, VANCE |
2022-02-28 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 2DNP 4NR |
2021-05-19 | House | FN3: (REV) |
2021-05-19 | House | FN2: (REV) |
2021-05-19 | House | FN1: (ADM) |
2021-05-19 | House | DNP: PRAX, EASTMAN |
2021-05-19 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, STORY, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-05-19 | House | W&M RPT CS(W&M) 5DP 2DNP |
2021-04-28 | House | W&M REPLACES CRA REFERRAL |
2021-02-18 | House | CRA, STA, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Appropriations
Business
Corporations
Funds
Leases
Minerals
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Revenue
Taxation
Trusts
Wages
Business
Corporations
Funds
Leases
Minerals
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Revenue
Taxation
Trusts
Wages