AK HB304 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska microloan revolving loan fund and loans from the fund.
Title
Microloan Revolving Fund & Loans; Report
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N1 A1 |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 304(FIN) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 304(FIN) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-05-04 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NR: MACKINNON, OLSON |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2018-04-17 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-15 | House | VERSION: CSHB 304(FIN) |
2018-04-15 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-15 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 304(FIN) |
2018-04-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-15 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-12 | House | AM: WILSON, TILTON |
2018-04-12 | House | DP: GARA, KAWASAKI, PRUITT, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-12 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 7DP 2AM |
2018-02-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-02-21 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, BIRCH |
2018-02-21 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, KITO |
2018-02-21 | House | L&C RPT 4DP 2NR |
2018-01-24 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2018-01-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-01-24 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |