AK HB290 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Real Estate Commission; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extending The Real Estate Commission
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/16 |
2016-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 24 SLA 16 |
2016-06-03 | House | 12:00 PM 6/2/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: HB 290 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 290 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | NR: BISHOP, OLSON, HOFFMAN |
2016-04-17 | Senate | DNP: DUNLEAVY |
2016-04-17 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FIN RPT 2DP 1DNP 3NR |
2016-04-16 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2016-04-16 | Senate | AM: GIESSEL, STEVENS |
2016-04-16 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MEYER |
2016-04-16 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 2AM |
2016-04-13 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2016-04-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-12 | House | VERSION: HB 290 |
2016-04-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2016-04-12 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2016-04-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 290 |
2016-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2016-04-12 | House | AM: KAWASAKI |
2016-04-12 | House | NR: PRUITT, WILSON, GUTTENBERG, GATTIS, EDGMON |
2016-04-12 | House | DP: SADDLER, MUNOZ, THOMPSON |
2016-04-12 | House | FIN RPT 3DP 5NR 1AM |
2016-03-31 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2016-03-31 | House | NR: LEDOUX, TILTON, KITO, JOSEPHSON, COLVER |
2016-03-31 | House | DP: HUGHES, OLSON |
2016-03-31 | House | L&C RPT 2DP 5NR |
2016-02-01 | House | L&C, FIN |
2016-02-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |