AK HB269 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/9/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/9/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to immunity for health care providers who provide health care services voluntarily and without pay; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Immunity For Vol. Health Care Provider
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House: CSHB 269(JUD) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - House - House: CSHB 269(JUD) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/9/14 |
2014-04-09 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 4/8 CHAPTER 6 SLA 14 |
2014-04-04 | House | 9:03 AM 4/4 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-02 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 269(JUD) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-02 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-02 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N2 E1 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FRENCH, ELLIS, WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-04-02 | Senate | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING |
2014-03-31 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/2 CALENDAR |
2014-03-31 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 269(JUD) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-31 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-31 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-03-28 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, ELLIS, STEDMAN |
2014-03-28 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR |
2014-03-26 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEDMAN |
2014-03-17 | Senate | L&C |
2014-03-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 269(JUD) |
2014-03-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, STOLTZE, JOHNSON, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, TARR |
2014-03-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-14 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2014-03-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 269(JUD) |
2014-03-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-14 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-03-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-03-05 | House | DP: MILLETT, LEDOUX, PRUITT, FOSTER, GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER |
2014-03-05 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 7DP |
2014-02-17 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-02-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-02-17 | House | DP: SEATON, PRUITT, KELLER, TARR, HIGGINS |
2014-02-17 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 5DP |
2014-01-21 | House | HSS, JUD |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Dentists
Liability
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Privileges & Immunities
Psychologists
Torts
Liability
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Privileges & Immunities
Psychologists
Torts