AK HB26 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4-4-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - FN3: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4-4-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-03 - FN3: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the official languages of the State of Alaska; renaming the Alaska Native Language Preservation and Advisory Council as the Council for Alaska Native Languages; relating to the transfer of the Council for Alaska Native Languages from the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development to the Department of Education and Early Development; and relating to the Council for Alaska Native Languages.
Title
Official Lang; Council For Ak Native Lang
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-10 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-10 - House - House: Take Up Concur (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-05-10 - House - House: Take Up Concur (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-03 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2024-09-03 | House | FN2: (EED) |
2024-09-03 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 268 |
2024-09-03 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/30/24 |
2024-08-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/29/24 |
2024-08-30 | House | LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 8/30 CH 48 SLA 24 |
2024-08-08 | House | 2:30 P.M. 8/8/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-05-10 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 11 |
2024-05-10 | House | CONCURRED AM OF (S) Y38 N1 A1 |
2024-05-10 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP Y34 N5 A1 |
2024-05-07 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2024-05-06 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 26(FIN) |
2024-05-06 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2024-05-06 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS |
2024-05-06 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 26(FIN) |
2024-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/6 CAL |
2024-05-03 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2024-05-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 11 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FN2: (EED) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | NR: WILSON, MERRICK |
2024-03-01 | Senate | DP: OLSON, BISHOP |
2024-03-01 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2024-01-31 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KIEHL, GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR, TOBIN |
2023-05-08 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2023-05-08 | Senate | NR: BJORKMAN |
2023-05-08 | Senate | DP: KAWASAKI, WIELECHOWSKI |
2023-05-08 | Senate | STA RPT 2DP 1NR |
2023-05-05 | Senate | STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | STA, FIN |
2023-05-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-05-03 | House | VERSION: CSHB 26(TRB) |
2023-05-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2023-05-03 | House | HIMSCHOOT, EDGMON, STAPP, CRONK, C.JOHNSON, MEARS |
2023-05-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DIBERT, ARMSTRONG, GROH, JOSEPHSON, SCHRAGE, GRAY, FIELDS, ORTIZ, |
2023-05-03 | House | PASSED Y37 N1 E2 |
2023-05-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 26(TRB) |
2023-05-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2023-05-03 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y1 N37 E2 |
2023-05-03 | House | TRB CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2023 |
2023-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MINA, MCCORMICK |
2023-04-28 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2023-04-28 | House | D.JOHNSON, FOSTER |
2023-04-28 | House | DP: TOMASZEWSKI, CRONK, ORTIZ, COULOMBE, STAPP, GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, |
2023-04-28 | House | FIN RPT CS(TRB) NEW TITLE 10DP |
2023-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN, HANNAN |
2023-03-22 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2023-03-22 | House | DP: CARPENTER, DIBERT, VANCE, ALLARD, MCCORMICK |
2023-03-22 | House | TRB RPT CS(TRB) NEW TITLE 5DP |
2023-02-10 | House | TRB REPLACED EDC REFERRAL |
2023-01-19 | House | EDC, FIN |
2023-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-01-19 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/23 |