AK HB20 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/20/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/20/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to commercial fishing loans for improving fuel efficiency and increasing the maximum amount for certain loans under the Commercial Fishing Loan Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fisheries Loans:energy Efficiency/amount
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/20/10 | |
2010-08-27 | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/19 CHAPTER 120 SLA 10 | |
2010-08-27 | 2:45 PM 8/12/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-16 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-16 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y27 E1 A12 | |
2010-04-16 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 20(FIN) | |
2010-04-16 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-16 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-16 | MEYER, HUGGINS, STEVENS | |
2010-04-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, FRENCH, KOOKESH, OLSON, WAGONER, MCGUIRE, EGAN, | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 20(FIN) | |
2010-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, DYSON, MENARD | |
2010-04-13 | FN2: (CED) | |
2010-04-13 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-04-13 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-13 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 20 | |
2010-04-13 | FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-02-12 | FN2: (CED) | |
2010-02-12 | AM: WAGONER, STEDMAN | |
2010-02-12 | NR: FRENCH, HUGGINS | |
2010-02-12 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS | |
2010-02-12 | RES RPT 2DP 2NR 2AM | |
2009-04-11 | RES, FIN | |
2009-04-11 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-10 | VERSION: CSHB 20(FIN) | |
2009-04-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-04-10 | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, SEATON, GARA, TUCK, LYNN | |
2009-04-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-10 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40 | |
2009-04-10 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC | |
2009-04-10 | STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2009-04-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-10 | PASSED Y40 | |
2009-04-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 20(FIN) | |
2009-04-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-10 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | FN1: (CED) | |
2009-04-01 | NR: SALMON, STOLTZE | |
2009-04-01 | DP: THOMAS, R.FOSTER, CRAWFORD, JOULE, GARA, AUSTERMAN, FAIRCLOUGH | |
2009-04-01 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 2NR | |
2009-02-16 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHANSEN | |
2009-02-04 | FN1: (CED) | |
2009-02-04 | AM: KAWASAKI | |
2009-02-04 | NR: JOHNSON, MILLETT, KELLER | |
2009-02-04 | DP: EDGMON, BUCH, MUNOZ | |
2009-02-04 | FSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 3DP 3NR 1AM | |
2009-01-30 | COSPONSOR(S): THOMAS, P.WILSON, MUNOZ | |
2009-01-22 | COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN | |
2009-01-20 | FSH, FIN | |
2009-01-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-20 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09 |