AK HB18 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to race classics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Race Classics

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-14SenateREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2017-04-14SenateFN1: ZERO(REV)
2017-04-14SenateNR: GARDNER, MACKINNON
2017-04-14SenateDP: BISHOP, STEDMAN
2017-04-14SenateCRA RPT SCS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2017-02-15SenateCRA, L&C
2017-02-15SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-02-13HouseVERSION: HB 18
2017-02-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-02-13HousePASSED Y36 N1 E3
2017-02-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 18
2017-02-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-02-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/13/2017
2017-02-10HouseFIN REFERRAL WAIVED
2017-02-06HouseFN1: ZERO(REV)
2017-02-06HouseNR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2017-02-06HouseDP: STUTES, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KNOPP, KITO
2017-02-06HouseL&C RPT 6DP 1NR
2017-01-18HouseL&C, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback