AK HB175 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/21/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/21/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act allowing, under certain conditions, a property or casualty insurer to provide policies and endorsements to an insured by posting the policies and endorsements on the insurer's Internet website.
Title
Electronic Posting Of Insurance Policies
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/21/13 |
2013-06-24 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/23 CHAPTER 18 SLA 13 |
2013-06-24 | House | 11:40 AM 5/23/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2013-04-11 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 175(L&C) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2013-04-11 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 175(L&C) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2013-04-10 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2013-04-10 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE |
2013-04-10 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 1NR |
2013-04-04 | Senate | L&C |
2013-04-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-03 | House | VERSION: CSHB 175(L&C) |
2013-04-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-04-03 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2013-04-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 175(L&C) |
2013-04-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-03 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2013-03-28 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD |
2013-03-28 | House | DP: SADDLER, MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, OLSON |
2013-03-28 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 3NR |
2013-03-18 | House | L&C |
2013-03-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |