AK HB165 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - COSPONSOR(S): STORY
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-19 - COSPONSOR(S): STORY
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making a special appropriation to the Alaska permanent fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Earnings Reserve To Perm Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2021-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2021-04-21 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-21 | House | DNP: EASTMAN, PRAX |
2021-04-21 | House | DP: JOSEPHSON, STORY, WOOL, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-04-21 | House | W&M RPT 4DP 2DNP |
2021-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-04-07 | House | W&M, FIN |
2021-04-07 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB165 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0165A.PDF |