AK HB160 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the licensing and regulation of athletic trainers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Licensing Of Athletic Trainers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2014-06-20 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 36 SLA 14 |
2014-06-13 | House | 2:19 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-30 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266 |
2014-05-15 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-04-22 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-22 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E2 A5 |
2014-04-22 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-22 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-22 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-21 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 160(FIN) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-21 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N2 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MEYER |
2014-04-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 160(FIN) |
2014-04-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-21 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-21 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-21 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2014-04-19 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2014-04-19 | Senate | DNP: DUNLEAVY |
2014-04-19 | Senate | DP: MEYER, FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP |
2014-04-19 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 3DP 1DNP 1NR TECH TITLE CHG (EFD ADDED) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FIN |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 160(FIN) |
2014-04-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-14 | House | PASSED Y35 N1 E1 A3 |
2014-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 160(FIN) |
2014-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2014-04-11 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2014-04-11 | House | NR: T.WILSON |
2014-04-11 | House | STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-04-11 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, NEUMAN, GARA, MUNOZ, EDGMON, HOLMES, COSTELLO, |
2014-04-11 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 10DP 1NR |
2014-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN |
2014-04-03 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2014-04-03 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, REINBOLD |
2014-04-03 | House | DP: MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER, OLSON |
2014-04-03 | House | L&C RPT 4DP 3NR |
2013-03-11 | House | L&C, FIN |
2013-03-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |