AK HB151 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to unemployment benefits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unemployment Benefits For Covid-19
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-17 | House | VERSION: CSHB 151(FIN) AM |
2021-05-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N13 |
2021-05-17 | House | PASSED Y22 N18 |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 151(FIN) AM |
2021-05-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR |
2021-05-15 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y20 N17 E3 |
2021-05-15 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-15 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-15 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | FN2: ZERO(LWF) |
2021-05-04 | House | AM: WOOL |
2021-05-04 | House | NR: EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK |
2021-05-04 | House | DP: ORTIZ, FOSTER |
2021-05-04 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 2DP 8NR 1AM |
2021-04-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2021-04-05 | House | AM: NELSON, MCCARTY |
2021-04-05 | House | DNP: KAUFMAN |
2021-04-05 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, SNYDER, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS |
2021-04-05 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 1DNP 2AM |
2021-03-26 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-03-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |