AK HB134 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring Medicaid payment for medication compliance packaging, delivery, and dispensing services of a prescription for specified recipients; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid Payment For Mediset Prescription
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, KELLY |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN |
2014-04-16 | Senate | LETTER OF INTENT WITH HSS REPORT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | HSS RPT 1DP 2NR |
2014-04-02 | Senate | HSS |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-01 | House | VERSION: CSHB 134(HSS) |
2014-04-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, ISAACSON |
2014-04-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-01 | House | PASSED Y37 E3 |
2014-04-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 134(HSS) |
2014-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, TARR |
2014-03-31 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR |
2014-03-31 | House | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-31 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-31 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2014 |
2014-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2014-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-03-28 | House | NR: THOMPSON, NEUMAN, T.WILSON, AUSTERMAN |
2014-03-28 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES, MUNOZ, GARA, COSTELLO, STOLTZE |
2014-03-28 | House | FIN RPT CS(HSS) NT 6DP 4NR |
2014-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG |
2014-03-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-03-17 | House | NR: PRUITT, KELLER |
2014-03-17 | House | DP: REINBOLD, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS |
2014-03-17 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 4DP 2NR |
2013-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON |
2013-02-20 | House | HSS, FIN |
2013-02-20 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |