AK HB123 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, COSTELLO
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-07 - COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, COSTELLO
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the transportation infrastructure fund, to local public transportation, to the municipal harbor facility grant fund, to motor fuel taxes, to the motor vehicle registration fee, to driver's license fees, to identification card fees, to the studded tire tax, to the vehicle rental tax, and to other fees and taxes related to motor vehicles; creating the Alaska Transportation Panel; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Dedicated Transport Fund/pub Transport
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT, COSTELLO |
2014-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON, THOMPSON |
2013-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE, JOHNSON, ISAACSON |
2013-03-20 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-03-20 | House | FN5: (DOT) |
2013-03-20 | House | FN4: (REV) |
2013-03-20 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2013-03-20 | House | FN2: (ADM) |
2013-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2013-03-20 | House | DP: JOHNSON, FEIGE, GATTIS, KREISS-TOMKINS, P.WILSON |
2013-03-20 | House | TRA RPT 5DP |
2013-02-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, GATTIS |
2013-02-15 | House | TRA, FIN |
2013-02-15 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Airports
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Capital Projects
Dedicated Funds
Fees
Funds
Highways
Licensing
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Planning
Public Finance
Public Works
Revenue
Taxation
Tourism
Trails
Transportation
Vessels
Aviation
Boats & Boating
Capital Projects
Dedicated Funds
Fees
Funds
Highways
Licensing
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Planning
Public Finance
Public Works
Revenue
Taxation
Tourism
Trails
Transportation
Vessels
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB123 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0123A.PDF |