AK HB117 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Certified Direct-Entry Midwives; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Board Of Direct-entry Midwives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21 |
2021-06-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 6 SLA 21 |
2021-06-09 | House | 4:30 P.M. 6/7/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: HB 117 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, KIEHL |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 117 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N14 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AM TO AM 1 FAILED Y7 N13 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | MOVE AM NO 1 TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR - MOTION OFFERED & WITHDRAWN |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RULED OUT OF ORDER/RULING APPEALED |
2021-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2021-05-18 | Senate | NR: WILSON, OLSON |
2021-05-18 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI |
2021-05-18 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FIN |
2021-05-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-12 | House | VERSION: HB 117 |
2021-05-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y40 |
2021-05-12 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 117 |
2021-05-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2021 |
2021-04-12 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-04-12 | House | NR: JOHNSON |
2021-04-12 | House | DP: EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2021-04-12 | House | FIN RPT 8DP 1NR |
2021-03-31 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2021-03-31 | House | NR: FIELDS |
2021-03-31 | House | DP: NELSON, MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-03-31 | House | L&C RPT 5DP 1NR |
2021-03-01 | House | L&C, FIN |
2021-03-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |