AK HB107 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - VETOED BY GOVERNOR 9/8/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - VETOED BY GOVERNOR 9/8/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the composition of the Board of Regents of the University of Alaska.
Title
Bd Of Regents Regional Residency Qualif.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] | Rep. Jim Colver [R] | Rep. Sam Kito [D] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] |
Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Rep. Cathy Munoz [R] | Rep. Mark Neuman [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] |
Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate:
2015-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
CSHB 107(EDC) am Third Reading - Final Passage(Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | House | VETOED BY GOVERNOR 9/8/16 |
2016-08-29 | House | 11:02 AM 8/29/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 107(EDC) AM |
2016-04-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-16 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2016-04-15 | Senate | ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2016-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N6 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 107(EDC) AM |
2016-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2016 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | NR: GARDNER |
2016-03-04 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, GIESSEL, HUGGINS |
2016-03-04 | Senate | EDC RPT 3DP 1NR |
2015-04-15 | Senate | EDC |
2015-04-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-14 | House | VERSION: CSHB 107(EDC) AM |
2015-04-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TILTON |
2015-04-14 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N13 E1 |
2015-04-14 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2015-04-14 | House | GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-04-14 | House | PASSED Y26 N13 E1 |
2015-04-14 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-14 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2015-04-14 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-14 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2015-04-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 107(EDC) |
2015-04-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN |
2015-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR |
2015-04-13 | House | EDC CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | FN1: ZERO(UA) |
2015-03-30 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS |
2015-03-30 | House | DNP: SEATON |
2015-03-30 | House | DP: COLVER, DRUMMOND, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, KELLER |
2015-03-30 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 5DP 1DNP 1NR |
2015-02-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2015-02-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO, KELLER, HUGHES |
2015-02-13 | House | EDC |
2015-02-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Appointments
Boards & Commissions
Education
Governor
Municipalities
Residency
Universities
Appointments
Boards & Commissions
Education
Governor
Municipalities
Residency
Universities