AK HB104 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/11/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to collecting information about civil litigation by the Alaska Judicial Council; repealing Rule 41(a)(3), Alaska Rules of Civil Procedure, and Rules 511(c) and (e), Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal Collection Of Civil Litig. Info
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/11/17 |
2017-05-12 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/10 CHAPTER 6 SLA 17 |
2017-05-08 | House | 4:13 PM 5/5/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-04-11 | Senate | VERSION: HB 104 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2017-04-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-11 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-11 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 104 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-04-11 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-11 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2017-03-15 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, KELLY, MEYER |
2017-03-15 | Senate | JUD RPT 5DP |
2017-03-01 | Senate | JUD |
2017-03-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-02-27 | House | VERSION: HB 104 |
2017-02-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-02-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-02-27 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-02-27 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-02-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 104 |
2017-02-27 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-02-27 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-02-27 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/27/2017 |
2017-02-24 | House | FN2: ZERO(LAW) |
2017-02-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(AJS) |
2017-02-24 | House | NR: EASTMAN, REINBOLD |
2017-02-24 | House | DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, CLAMAN |
2017-02-24 | House | JUD RPT 4DP 2NR |
2017-02-03 | House | JUD |
2017-02-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |