WY SJ0012 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION providing for the assessment of residential real property as a separate property class for the purpose of taxation and providing for valuation of residential real property.
Title
Constitutional amendment-property tax valuation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-24 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-01-24 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |