WY SJ0011 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:Failed 21-41-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:Failed 21-41-0-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to call a convention for proposing amendments to the United States Constitution as specified.
Title
Convention of states.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - COW:Failed 21-41-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | COW:Failed 21-41-0-0-0 |
2023-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-24 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-13-1-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-02 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | :Rerefer to S07 - Corporations |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |