WY SJ0002 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Governor Signed SEJR No. 0001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to enact legislation requiring revenues received by the federal government from wind and solar energy developments on lands of the United States be shared equally with the state in which those developments are located.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal land wind and solar energy revenue- state share.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10 Governor Signed SEJR No. 0001
2017-02-22HouseSpeaker Signed SEJR No. 0001
2017-02-21SenatePresident Signed SEJR No. 0001
2017-02-16 Assigned Number SEJR No. 0001
2017-02-16House3rd Reading:Passed 55-0-5-0-0
2017-02-15House2nd Reading:Passed
2017-02-14HouseCOW:Passed
2017-02-10HousePlaced on General File
2017-02-10HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2017-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2017-01-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2017-01-18Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2017-01-17Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2017-01-16SenateCOW:Passed
2017-01-16SenatePlaced on General File
2017-01-16SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2017-01-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2017-01-03 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback