WY SJ0002 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION proposing to amend the Wyoming Constitution to authorize the investment of state funds not designated as permanent funds of the state in equities upon a two-thirds vote of both houses of the legislature.
Title
Investment of state funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted SJ0002JC001: 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SJ0002JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted SJ0002JC001: 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SJ0002JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-23-7-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-23-7-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SJ0002JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Adopted SJ0002JC001: 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SJ0002JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-23-7-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Failed 0-23-7-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEJR No. 0001 | |
2015-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEJR No. 0001 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEJR No. 0001 |
2015-03-05 | Assigned Number SEJR No. 0001 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Adopted SJ0002JC001: 50-9-1-0-0 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Adopted SJ0002JC001: 28-1-1-0-0 |
2015-03-04 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Concur:Failed 0-23-7-0-0 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-20 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 48-11-1-0-0 |
2015-02-19 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-11 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-11 | Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-0-0-0 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-23 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-01-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-01-21 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-01-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2015-01-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-19 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 | |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-12 | Bill Number Assigned |