WY SJ0001 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - Did not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A JOINT RESOLUTION requesting Congress to introduce a bill and enact law to amend Wyoming's act of admission to authorize the expenditure of earnings for the support of the common schools in Wyoming and to amend the authority for leasing state school lands.
Title
Amending Wyoming's act of admission for leases and earnings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-13 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | Did not Consider for Introduction |
2023-01-13 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-13 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-11 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-09 | Bill Number Assigned |