WY SF1001 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned Chapter Number 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-20 - Assigned Chapter Number 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the emergency expenses of government; providing legislative findings; authorizing emergency governmental programs as specified; requiring reporting; providing an appropriation; specifying conditions on the appropriation and expenditure of funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Emergency appropriation-COVID-19 funds-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-16 - House - Adopted SF1001JC001: 53-6-1-0-0 (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-16 - Senate - Adopted SF1001JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment failed 8-21-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment failed 4-25-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-16 - Senate - Adopted SF1001JC001: 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment failed 8-21-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Amendment failed 4-25-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | Assigned Chapter Number 1 | |
2020-05-20 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0001 | |
2020-05-16 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0001 |
2020-05-16 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0001 |
2020-05-16 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0001 | |
2020-05-16 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-05-16 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2020-05-16 | House | House:Pursuant to JR 23-1 (h) referred directly to 3rd Reading |
2020-05-16 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-05-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 |
2020-05-15 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to SCOW |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-05-07 | Bill Number Assigned |