WY SF0172 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; specifying requirements for the hiring and retention of investment managers, trustees and fiduciaries who invest state funds as specified; specifying proxy voting requirements for investment managers, trustees and fiduciaries who invest state funds; providing definitions; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Stop ESG-State funds fiduciary duty act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-14-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Amendment adopted 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-14-0-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Amendment adopted 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-22 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Not Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 17-14-0-0-0 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-01 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |