WY SF0171 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - COW:S Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to banks, banking and finance; providing legislative findings; prohibiting disclosure or use of protected information relating to firearms and ammunition sales as specified; prohibiting discrimination related to firearm sales codes as specified; providing exceptions; providing requirements for disclosure; authorizing civil actions; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming second amendment financial privacy act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | COW:S Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-02 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Bill Number Assigned |