WY SF0159 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 193
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public utilities; limiting the recovery of costs for the retirement of coal fired electric generation facilities; providing a process for the sale of an otherwise retiring coal fired electric generation facility; exempting a person purchasing an otherwise retiring coal fired electric generation facility from regulation as a public utility; requiring purchase of electricity generated from purchased retiring coal fired electric generation facility as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New opportunities for Wyoming coal fired generation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-0-2-0-1 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-8-2-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-1-0-1 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 193
2019-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0074
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0074
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0074
2019-02-27 Assigned Number SEA No. 0074
2019-02-27SenateConcur:Passed 27-0-2-0-1
2019-02-27SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Passed 50-8-2-0-0
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-1-0-1
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-02-01SenatePlaced on General File
2019-02-01SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-25SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback