WY SF0157 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 117
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to weed and pest control; clarifying that the Eastern Shoshone and Northern Arapaho tribes may apply for participation in specified emergency insect management programs; requiring coordination with weed and pest control districts for emergency programs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Weed and pest mitigation-tribal inclusion-2.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Ember Oakley [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Edward Cooper [R] |
Sen. Affie Ellis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 117 | |
2023-02-27 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0065 | |
2023-02-24 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0065 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0065 |
2023-02-24 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0065 | |
2023-02-24 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-23 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-22 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-15 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-2-0-0-0 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-02 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-31 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | :Refer to S06 - Travel |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |