WY SF0155 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-26 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to big game licenses; providing for a specified percentage of big game licenses to be issued as archery only licenses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Big game licenses-archery licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-05 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S06 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 |
2013-02-06 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-02-01 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |