WY SF0148 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - Assigned Chapter Number 110
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to weapons; clarifying the applicability of the preemption of firearms regulation by the state as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Preemption of local firearms regulation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-1-1-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | Assigned Chapter Number 110 | |
2023-02-27 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0056 | |
2023-02-24 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0056 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0056 |
2023-02-23 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0056 | |
2023-02-23 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-1-1-0-0 |
2023-02-22 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-21 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-15 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-08 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-02-03 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | :Refer to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |