WY SF0148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-5-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to United States lands; providing for operation of a federal facility; allowing interstate cooperation; providing for return of a facility to federal control; allowing contingency planning; creating an exception in the public records act; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - H09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-5-1-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-1-0-0 (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseH09 - Minerals:Do Pass Failed 3-5-1-0-0
2019-02-12HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-02-08HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-06Senate3rd Reading:Passed 17-12-1-0-0
2019-02-05Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-04SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-31SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-30SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-29SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-29SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback