WY SF0147 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the legislature; authorizing joint interim committees to select interim topics; amending authority of the management council to assign or reject interim topics for joint interim committees; making conforming amendments; amending provisions related to studies that must be approved by management council as specified; limiting management council authority as specified; requiring management council policy changes; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Management council authority and legislative committees.
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Rep. Mike Greear [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] |
Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Did Not Consider for Introduction |
2021-03-31 | House | Did not Consider for Introduction |
2021-03-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-11 | Senate | S12 - Rules:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S12 - Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-01 | Bill Number Assigned |