WY SF0147 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state employees; requiring budget recommendations with additional use of at-will contract employees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Department of health facilities-contract employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] | Sen. Wyatt Agar [R] |
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - House - H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2019-02-15 | House | H10 - Labor:Do Pass Failed 2-7-0-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-02-08 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-31 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |