WY SF0147 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0066
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 22 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-25 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0066
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and hospitals; providing for designation by the department of health of hospitals as centers for heart attack and stroke care as specified; providing designation criteria; granting rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Stroke and heart attack treatment centers.
Sponsors
Sen. Bernadine Craft [D] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Floyd Esquibel [D] | Sen. Leslie Nutting [R] |
Sen. Eric Barlow [R] | Rep. Elaine Harvey [R] | Rep. Norine Kasperik [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-22 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - H10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - S10 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-25 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0066 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0066 |
2013-02-25 | Assigned Number SEA0066 | |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Did Concur |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-20 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-02-20 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2013-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-12 | House | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 |
2013-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-29 | Amendment Adopted | |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |