WY SF0146 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - 3rd Reading:Failed 28-31-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to a possible expansion of the Medicaid program; requiring a study of the benefits and costs of expanding the Medicaid program; assigning duties to the insurance department, the department of family services, the department of health and the state library; providing for actuarial and other studies; providing exceptions to state contracting rules and regulations; setting reporting dates; providing definitions; authorizing an additional position; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid expansion study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 28-31-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-6-2-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Failed 28-31-1-0-0
2019-02-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-13HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-13HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
2019-02-08HouseH10 - Labor:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseH10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2019-02-05HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-04Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-6-2-0-0
2019-02-01Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-31SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-30SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2019-01-28SenateS10 - Labor:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-28SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2019-01-24SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-23 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback