WY SF0145 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 196 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; providing for payments to acute care hospitals for uncompensated charity care as specified; providing definitions; creating a grant program for uncompensated charity care as specified; creating an account; providing an appropriation; providing a sunset date; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital uncompensated care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-06 - House - Adopted SF0145JC001: 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Adopted SF0145JC001: 20-7-3-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - Adopted SF0145JC001: 42-15-3-0-0 (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - Senate - Adopted SF0145JC001: 20-7-3-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Concur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0 (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - Senate - COW:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-3-1-0 (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-3-1-0 (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-3-1-0 (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 196 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0090
2015-03-06HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0090
2015-03-06SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0090
2015-03-06 Assigned Number SEA No. 0090
2015-03-06HouseAdopted SF0145JC001: 42-15-3-0-0
2015-03-06SenateAdopted SF0145JC001: 20-7-3-0-0
2015-03-05SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-05SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-05HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-05SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-03-05SenateConcur:Failed 1-28-1-0-0
2015-03-05SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-04House3rd Reading:Passed 50-9-1-0-0
2015-03-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02House2nd Reading:Laid Back
2015-02-27HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-26 Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-2-0-0-0
2015-02-24HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2015-02-24HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-24 Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2015-02-12HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-11Senate3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0
2015-02-10Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-09SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-05SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-05 Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 1-3-1-0-0
2015-02-04SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-02-04SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-04 Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-29SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2015-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback