WY SF0144 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 165 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages; amending the production minimum for microbreweries; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Microbreweries-minimum barrel requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 165 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0064
2015-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0064
2015-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0064
2015-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0064
2015-03-03House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2015-03-02House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-27HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-25 Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2015-02-11HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2015-02-10HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-02-10Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2015-02-09Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-06SenateCOW:Passed
2015-02-05SenatePlaced on General File
2015-02-05 Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-29SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2015-01-28SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback