WY SF0141 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-27 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to county roads; increasing the county budgeted amount and state matching contribution to the University of Wyoming's transportation technology transfer center program; allocating amounts for gravel county roads; conforming and correcting county and city funding provisions; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Transportation technology transfer center program funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2023-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-23 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-21 | House | :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-02-21 | House | H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation |
2023-02-03 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-02-03 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-01 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-27 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | :Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | Senate | S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |