WY SF0136 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Enrolled on February 26 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0078
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to oil and gas; modifying surety provisions for seismic activities; modifying rule requirements; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seismic exploration-3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-26 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - House - H05 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S Reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - S Failed 3rd Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0078
2013-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0078
2013-02-26 Assigned Number SEA0078
2013-02-26SenateDid Concur
2013-02-26SenateReceived for Concurrence
2013-02-26HousePassed 3rd Reading
2013-02-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2013-02-25 Amendment Failed
2013-02-22HousePassed CoW
2013-02-22 Amendment Adopted
2013-02-22HouseAmendments Adopted
2013-02-21HousePlaced on General File
2013-02-21HouseRecommended Do Pass
2013-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05
2013-02-01HouseReceived for Introduction
2013-01-31SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2013-01-31SenateReconsidered
2013-01-31SenateFailed 3rd Reading
2013-01-31 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-31 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-30SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2013-01-30 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-30 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-29SenatePassed CoW
2013-01-29 Amendment Failed
2013-01-29 Amendment Failed
2013-01-29 Amendment Adopted
2013-01-29SenateAmendments Adopted
2013-01-23SenatePlaced on General File
2013-01-23SenateRecommended Amend and Do Pass
2013-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09
2013-01-17SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback