WY SF0135 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school districts; prohibiting specified expenditures of funds by school districts; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Education funds used for litigation.
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Burns [R] | Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Rep. Donald Burkhart [R] | Rep. Tyler Lindholm [R] | Rep. Tom Walters [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-28 - Senate - S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3-0-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 2-3- | |
2017-02-03 | Senate | No report prior to COW Cutoff |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |