WY SF0134 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-24 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to property and agriculture; requiring information concerning adjacent farm and ranch operations in property disclosure statements to prospective buyers as specified; making conforming amendments; providing definitions; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Right to farm-real estate disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-30 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-1-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-24 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2023-02-24 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2023-01-30 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-30 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-10-1-0-0 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2023-01-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-25 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |