WY SF0134 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to school finance; repealing the requirement that school districts provide evidence to the state of average student- teacher ratio to share in the distribution of funds from the foundation account; repealing associated waiver; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School finance-class size waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 (Y: 0 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | postponed indefinitely |
2017-02-14 | House | H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 0-9-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2017-02-03 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-27 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |