WY SF0133 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Did Not Consider for Introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to abortions; prohibiting abortifacient drugs for abortions as specified; providing a criminal penalty for violating the prohibition on abortifacient drugs; providing definitions; specifying exceptions; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting abortifacients and chemical abortions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31HouseDid Not Consider for Introduction
2021-03-31HouseDid not Consider for Introduction
2021-03-19HouseReceived for Introduction
2021-03-19Senate3rd Reading:Passed 22-7-1-0-0
2021-03-18Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2021-03-17SenateCOW:Passed
2021-03-10SenatePlaced on General File
2021-03-10SenateS10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
2021-03-08Senate:Rerefer to S10 - Labor
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
2021-03-01SenateReceived for Introduction
2021-03-01 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback