WY SF0133 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 193 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 193 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to game and fish; providing an appropriation; directing the removal or relocation of big horn sheep as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Bighorn sheep relocation.
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Cooper [R] | Sen. Dan Dockstader [R] | Sen. Fred Emerich [R] | Sen. Gerald Geis [R] |
Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Rep. John Eklund [R] | Rep. Robert McKim [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0133JC001: 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0133JC001: 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0133JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0133JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0 (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - Adopted SF0133JC001: 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0133JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Adopted SF0133JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Concur:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0 (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 193 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0083 | |
2015-03-05 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0083 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0083 |
2015-03-05 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0083 | |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted SF0133JC001: 37-22-1-0-0 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Adopted SF0133JC001: 24-5-1-0-0 |
2015-03-04 | House | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Appointed JCC01 Members |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Concur:Failed 15-14-1-0-0 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-03-02 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 |
2015-02-27 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-26 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-24 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-24 | Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-3-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-20 | House | COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-20 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-20 | Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2015-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-05 | Appropriations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0 | |
2015-02-04 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-04 | Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-29 | :Rerefer to S05 - Agriculture | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-27 | Bill Number Assigned |