WY SF0132 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to gaming; amending statutes concerning gaming and gambling; amending exceptions to the prohibition on gambling; establishing the Wyoming gaming commission to regulate specified types of gaming; providing for administration, licensure, fees, revenue distribution and penalties; authorizing local authorities to prohibit specified types of gaming; authorizing criminal background checks; amending a public records provision; providing applicability; providing for a transfer of funds and an appropriation; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wyoming gaming commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0 (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04Senatepostponed indefinitely
2019-01-31SenateS06 - Travel:Do Pass Failed 1-4-0-0-0
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-23SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-22 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback