WY SF0131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to public health; providing that no abortion shall be performed after the embryo or fetus has a detectable fetal heartbeat; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human heartbeat protection act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 20-10-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateS:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2020-02-25SenateNo report prior to CoW Cutoff
2020-02-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor 20-10-0-0-0
2020-02-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2020-02-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback