WY SF0127 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0035
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 15 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-22 - Speaker Signed SEA No. 0035
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to liens; modifying provisions relating to notice; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Lien notice.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Sen. John Schiffer [R] | Rep. Kermit Brown [R] |
Rep. Keith Gingery [R] | Rep. Samuel Krone [R] | Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] |
Rep. Tim Stubson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - H01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0035 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0035 |
2013-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA0035 | |
2013-02-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-02-13 | House | Passed CoW |
2013-02-07 | House | Placed on General File |
2013-02-07 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2013-01-29 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 |
2013-01-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2013-01-24 | Amendment Failed | |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |