WY SF0126 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Assigned Chapter Number 121
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to law enforcement; amending the definitions of peace officer with respect to game and fish law enforcement personnel as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Game and fish law enforcement definition amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. William Haley [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Charles Pelkey [D] | Rep. Clark Stith [R] |
Rep. Cyrus Western [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Glenn Moniz [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Assigned Chapter Number 121 | |
2020-03-17 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0051 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0051 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0051 |
2020-03-11 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0051 | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Concur:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2020-03-10 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 41-17-2-0-0 |
2020-03-09 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-04 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-17 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-5-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |