WY SF0125 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to gaming; specifying persons involved in horse racing and pari-mutuel wagering activities who shall be subject to criminal background checks; specifying rulemaking requirements for the Wyoming gaming commission; providing definitions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pari-mutuel wagering activities-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-8-1-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-11-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-11-0-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 104 | |
2024-03-21 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0049 | |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0049 |
2024-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0049 | |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Concur:Passed 22-8-1-0-0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 51-11-0-0-0 |
2024-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-29 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-2-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-20 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 29-2-0-0-0 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |