WY SF0120 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 75 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Chapter No. 75 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act; incorporating the 2008 amendments proposed by the Uniform Laws Commission; amending and creating definitions; clarifying procedures; providing for recognition, registration and cooperation in issuing, modifying and enforcing family support and modification orders and determinations of parentage of children involving parties that live in foreign countries as specified; providing for applicability of the act; providing for severability of provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Uniform Interstate Family Support Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Ross [R] | Rep. Bob Nicholas [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-06 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Chapter No. 75 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-03 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-03 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0035 | |
2015-02-26 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0035 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0035 |
2015-02-26 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0035 | |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2015-02-25 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 55-4-1-0-0 |
2015-02-24 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-23 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-18 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-18 | Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2015-02-09 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-06 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-04 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-23 | Bill Number Assigned |